Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 518 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6129 Week
» 17175 Month
» 17175 Year
» 1682551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1111 m/e 10/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6111   18/10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1348   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1475   27/10/1946
British Railways 61475   12/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B910/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9456
Works Number 4812
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Mon 16/05/1949 off Heaton Mersey (19D)
Scrapping During 07/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Withdrawn on 7/7/1939 but CME Order No 953 for repair was issued 11/9/39 in order to help with the war effort

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1906
LIN Lincoln m/e 10/1916
GOR Gorton on 12/11/1926
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 28/11/1927
GOR Gorton on 13/08/1929
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 25/10/1929
GOR Gorton on 30/04/1932
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 02/02/1935
GOR Gorton on 19/06/1936
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 05/08/1938
GOR Gorton on 30/09/1938
   Withdrawn on 07/07/1939
GOR Gorton (Reinstated) (Reinstated for war effort - repairs authorised on 11/9/39) on 11/09/1939
19D Heaton Mersey on 07/12/1939
GOR Gorton on 08/11/1941
LIV Brunswick on 09/05/1943
19D Heaton Mersey on 18/07/1943
   Withdrawn on 16/05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   on 15/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1221)
28/01/1911 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1222)
16/10/1915 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1220)
18/10/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 553)
05/10/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
18/06/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)
25/08/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)
03/10/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)
21/10/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 837)
19/12/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3738)
29/03/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/12/1910 28/01/1911 43 days General
Boiler number 1222 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1915 16/10/1915 22 days General
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1921 24/09/1921 141 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 18/10/1924 204 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6111
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 25/06/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/08/1929 05/10/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1932 18/06/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1934 25/08/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1936 03/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1938 29/01/1938 22 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1939 21/10/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1942 19/12/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1944 11/11/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 29/03/1947 71 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1111
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4812
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
10/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
12/11/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
13/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
30/04/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
19/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
30/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/09/1939 Reinstated Reinstated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
08/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
18/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1348 but not taken up    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1475    
12/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61475    
16/05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61475 from Heaton Mersey (19D)    

prev prev