Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 693 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7376 Week
» 18422 Month
» 18422 Year
» 1683798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1112 m/e 10/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6112   20/12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1349   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1476   10/11/1946
British Railways 61476   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B910/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9456
Works Number 4813
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Thu 19/08/1948 off Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/8/48 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1906
LIN Lincoln m/e 04/1922
GOR Gorton on 26/05/1927
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 28/05/1932
GOR Gorton on 04/03/1933
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 31/05/1940
GOR Gorton on 06/11/1942
LIV Brunswick on 27/06/1943
GOR Gorton on 31/07/1943
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 13/08/1944
   Withdrawn on 19/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 19/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1222)
23/04/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 827)
25/10/1919 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1216)
20/12/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 595)
28/03/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1696)
22/04/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1711)
06/07/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
05/06/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1918)
02/03/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
16/01/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
03/03/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
26/04/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3733)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/03/1910 23/04/1910 36 days General
Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1911 29/04/1911 30 days General
New left hand cylinder fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1918 25/10/1919 337 days General
Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1922 08/04/1922 78 days General  
Gorton Works 23/08/1924 20/12/1924 120 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6112
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1927 28/05/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 15/12/1928 09/02/1929 57 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 28/03/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 22/04/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1935 06/07/1935 22 days General
Heat connector fitted at front
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1937 05/06/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1940 02/03/1940 29 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1942 16/01/1943 33 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1945 03/03/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1947 26/04/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 23/08/1947 15 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1112
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4813
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
04/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
26/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/05/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
04/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
06/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
31/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1349 but not taken up    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1476    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61476 but not taken up    
19/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1476 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    

prev prev