|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/03/1910 | 23/04/1910 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1911 | 29/04/1911 | 30 days | General | New left hand cylinder fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1918 | 25/10/1919 | 337 days | General | Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1922 | 08/04/1922 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1924 | 20/12/1924 | 120 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6112 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1927 | 28/05/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1928 | 09/02/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1933 | 22/04/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 22 days | General | Heat connector fitted at front Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 29 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1112 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4813 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
19/03/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1910. Dep: 23/04/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
31/03/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1911. Dep: 29/04/1911. Work undertaken: New left hand cylinder fitted |
||
23/11/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1918. Dep: 25/10/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9) |
||
21/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1922. Dep: 08/04/1922. | ||
04/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
23/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6112 |
||
09/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 28/05/1927. | ||
26/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
15/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. | ||
28/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/05/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
04/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Heat connector fitted at front Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
06/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
15/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
31/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
03/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1349 but not taken up | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1476 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61476 but not taken up | ||
19/08/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1476 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |