Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1114 m/e 10/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6114   30/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1351   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1478   25/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B910/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9456
Works Number 4815
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Wed 10/12/1947 off Brunswick (LIV)
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 13/12/47 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1906
GOR   Gorton on 10/02/1920
TFD   Trafford Park (LNER) on 18/07/1934
GOR   Gorton on 17/06/1935
TFD   Trafford Park (LNER) on 13/04/1940
GOR   Gorton on 06/11/1942
LIV   Brunswick on 26/08/1945
     Withdrawn on 10/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN LIV Brunswick on 10/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1224)
27/05/1911 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1221)
16/08/1924 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1827)
27/04/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1772)
08/04/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 728)
17/08/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 920)
17/07/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
27/01/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3722)
28/07/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 28/04/1911 27/05/1911 30 days General Boiler number 1221 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1921 25/03/1922 120 days General    
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 16/08/1924 162 days General Boiler number 1827 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1926 03/04/1926 57 days General    
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 12/11/1927 92 days General    
Gorton Works 09/02/1929 27/04/1929 78 days General Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1931 21/02/1931 29 days General    
Gorton Works 25/03/1933 08/04/1933 15 days General Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 17/08/1935 22 days General Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1937 17/07/1937 29 days General Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1940 27/01/1940 22 days General Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1942 26/12/1942 25 days General    
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 28/07/1945 29 days General Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1946 25/05/1946 29 days Light Repair New cylinders fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1114
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4815
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
28/04/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1911. Dep: 27/05/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram GC9)
   
10/02/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1921. Dep: 25/03/1922.    
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1827 (Diagram GC9)
   
30/08/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6114    
06/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.    
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927.    
09/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931.    
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
17/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
06/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942.    
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/08/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1351 but not taken up    
27/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1478    
10/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1478 from Brunswick (LIV)    

prev