Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1349 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14755 Week
» 67771 Month
» 187298 Year
» 3214151 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1530 |
m/e |
11/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8530 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7444 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1530 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61530 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
M77 |
To Service |
During 11/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/11/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
05/1938 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1530 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8530 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
05/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7444 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1530 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61530 |
|
|
16/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
25/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61530 |
|
|