Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17689 Week
» 70705 Month
» 190232 Year
» 3217085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1549 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8549 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7463 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1549 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
61549 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
144 |
To Service |
During 06/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/01/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1921 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
16/02/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
25/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
07/1941 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1549 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 144 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8549 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
07/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7463 but not taken up |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1549 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61549 |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61549 |
|
|