Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1560 |
m/e |
04/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8560 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7474 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1560 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61560 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
154 |
To Service |
During 04/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/05/1952 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1921 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/05/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/05/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
03/1941 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 61539/60, 62277, 4486, 65215/31, 5271, 5318, 67455, ex-L.M.S. 40670, 15176, 15269, 17241, 17396, 17609. |
SLS/195006 |
30/06/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1560 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 154 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8560 |
|
|
05/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
03/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7474 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1560 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61560 |
|
|
09/05/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61560 |
|
|