Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3181 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16587 Week
» 69603 Month
» 189130 Year
» 3215983 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8577 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7491 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1577 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61577 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
1513 |
Works Number |
6493 |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/09/1959 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 28 dys |
Information |
Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1931 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
01/1934 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8577 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
01/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
10/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7491 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1577 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61577 |
|
|
16/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
28/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61577 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|