|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1920 | 12/1920 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D1035 (Diagram 54Sup) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 02/11/1923 | 11/01/1924 | 71 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1925 | 10/07/1925 | 78 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1927 | 29/08/1927 | 124 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/07/1930 | 28/08/1930 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1421 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1931 | 30/03/1931 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1933 | 15/11/1933 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D1035 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1936 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1906 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 775 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 51 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/12/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D1035 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
02/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1923. Dep: 11/01/1924. | ||
07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
24/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1925. Dep: 10/07/1925. | ||
28/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1927. Dep: 29/08/1927. | ||
18/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1930. Dep: 28/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1421 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
24/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1931. Dep: 30/03/1931. | ||
09/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1933. Dep: 15/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1035 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
07/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/08/1936. | ||
15/08/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 775 from York (North) (YK) |