|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1916 | 08/1916 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G707 (Diagram 54Sup) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 20/11/1924 | 11/02/1925 | 84 days | General | Boiler number D1396 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1927 | 11/01/1928 | 94 days | General | Boiler number D1926 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1930 | 29/01/1931 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1526 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1934 | 10/04/1934 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1421 (Diagram 54Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 738 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 94 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/08/1916. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G707 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
20/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1924. Dep: 11/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1396 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
04/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
10/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1927. Dep: 11/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1926 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1930. Dep: 29/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1526 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
08/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1934. Dep: 10/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1421 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
30/07/1938 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 738 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |