|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1921 | 12/1921 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Gateshead Works | 11/02/1925 | 24/04/1925 | 73 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/01/1926 | 22/02/1926 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/10/1927 | 30/12/1927 | 78 days | General | Boiler number D1842 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Gateshead Works | 06/06/1930 | 30/07/1930 | 55 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 745 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 99 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/12/1921. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1921 | Modification | Diagram 54Sup number G709 boiler fitted | ||
11/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1925. Dep: 24/04/1925. | ||
19/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1926. Dep: 22/02/1926. | ||
14/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1927. Dep: 30/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1842 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
06/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1930. Dep: 30/07/1930. | ||
08/12/1931 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 745 from Tweedmouth (TWD) |