|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1913 | 03/1913 | General | Boiler number G707 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1915 | 10/1915 | General | Boiler number G732 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1919 | 11/1919 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1924 | 03/09/1924 | 83 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1927 | 23/06/1927 | 83 days | General | Boiler number D1869 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1930 | 07/03/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1932 | 25/08/1932 | 56 days | General | Used for counter pressure tests Boiler number D1517 (Diagram 54Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1909 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 756 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 110 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/03/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number G707 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/10/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number G732 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/11/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1919 | Modification | Diagram 54Sup number G720 boiler fitted | ||
01/1923 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
13/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1924. Dep: 03/09/1924. | ||
07/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 23/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1869 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
16/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1930. Dep: 07/03/1930. | ||
01/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1932. Dep: 25/08/1932. Work undertaken: Used for counter pressure tests Boiler number D1517 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
21/09/1934 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 756 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |