Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 13 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1850 Week
» 12995 Month
» 112780 Year
» 1778156 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 840 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1400   25/09/1946
British Railways (Orig) 61400   19/02/1949
British Railways 61469 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1919 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Wed 19/10/1960 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 19/10/60

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
HTN   Heaton (New) m/e 12/1919
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 27/11/1930
YK   York (North) on 28/03/1943
SKN   Stockton on 06/05/1946
YK   York (North) on 25/10/1947
NEV   Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
52B   Heaton on 25/09/1955
52C   Blaydon on 13/05/1956
52B   Heaton on 08/07/1956
50C   Selby on 08/06/1958
50A   York (North) on 13/09/1959
     Withdrawn on 19/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D998)
26/09/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2264)
10/03/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1206)
11/05/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1218)
02/02/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1559)
18/11/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2728)
11/08/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2560)
19/02/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3937)
07/02/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24075)
31/08/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24106)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gateshead Works 07/00/1922 29/11/1922   General    
Gateshead Works 03/02/1926 17/06/1926 135 days General    
Gateshead Works 21/09/1927 09/11/1927 50 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 11/07/1929 26/09/1929 78 days General Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 07/02/1933 10/03/1933 32 days General Boiler number D1206 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 04/03/1936 11/05/1936 69 days General Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 12/05/1936 18/05/1936 7 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 20/01/1937 02/03/1937 42 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 16/11/1937 17/12/1937 32 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 28/12/1939 02/02/1940 37 days General Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1941 18/11/1941 16 days General Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/09/1942 16/10/1942 30 days General    
Darlington Works 17/10/1942 23/10/1942 7 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 04/07/1945 11/08/1945 39 days General Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 10/09/1946 27/09/1946 18 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1400
 
Darlington Works 14/01/1949 19/02/1949 37 days General Boiler number 3937 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61400
 
Darlington Works 14/01/1953 07/02/1953 25 days General Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 23/03/1955 23/04/1955 32 days Heavy Intermediate    
Darlington Works 25/04/1955 29/04/1955 5 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 20/05/1957 04/06/1957 16 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 30/07/1957 31/08/1957 33 days General Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 02/09/1957 04/09/1957 3 days Unclassified    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 840
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
07/00/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/00/1922. Dep: 29/11/1922.    
03/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1926. Dep: 17/06/1926.    
21/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1927. Dep: 09/11/1927.    
11/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1929. Dep: 26/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
   
27/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
07/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1933. Dep: 10/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1206 (Diagram 49)
   
04/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1936. Dep: 11/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49)
   
12/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1936. Dep: 18/05/1936.    
20/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1937. Dep: 02/03/1937.    
16/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1937. Dep: 17/12/1937.    
28/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1939. Dep: 02/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
   
03/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1941. Dep: 18/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49)
   
17/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1942. Dep: 16/10/1942.    
17/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 23/10/1942.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49)
   
06/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
10/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1946. Dep: 27/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1400
   
25/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
14/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3937 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61400
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
24/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61469    
14/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A)
   
23/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955.    
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 29/04/1955.    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
13/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
08/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
20/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 04/06/1957.    
30/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1957. Dep: 04/09/1957.    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
19/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61469 from York (North) (50A)    
11/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev