|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 29/03/1923 | 13/06/1923 | 77 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/01/1926 | 10/06/1926 | 141 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/03/1927 | 17/03/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/03/1928 | 28/04/1928 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/08/1929 | 05/11/1929 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/11/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1933 | 07/07/1933 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1936 | 26/05/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1938 | 13/12/1938 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1938 | 23/12/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1941 | 01/08/1941 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1944 | 05/07/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3452 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/12/1948 | 20/12/1948 | 19 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61401 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24003 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1956 | 23/04/1956 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1956 | 24/05/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1956 | 26/06/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1956 | 12/10/1956 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1959 | 13/11/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1954 | Q1 on passenger train! | On Saturday 21/8/54 the unusual event occurred of a Q1 0-8-0T hauling a passenger train, albeit for a short distance. On this date B16/1 61470 (50B) failed with a blown middle cylinder cover between Gascoigne Woad and Hagg Lane whilst working the 9.45 a.m. passenger train from Leeds City to Hull. 69933 (50C), one of the Gascoigne Wood hump pilots, was requisitioned to haul the disabled engine and train into Selby, where 61470 was removed by 69933 to the shed and the train worked forward by J39 64947 (50F). | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 841 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
29/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1923. Dep: 13/06/1923. | ||
21/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1926. Dep: 10/06/1926. | ||
08/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1927. Dep: 17/03/1927. | ||
28/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928. | ||
27/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1929. Dep: 05/11/1929. | ||
20/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. | ||
27/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
24/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1933. Dep: 07/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1936. Dep: 26/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1938. Dep: 13/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938. | ||
09/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1941. Dep: 01/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 05/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3452 (Diagram 49A) |
||
12/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1401 | ||
20/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61401 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61470 | ||
08/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24003 (Diagram 49A) |
||
24/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. | ||
23/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1956. Dep: 23/04/1956. | ||
22/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1956. Dep: 24/05/1956. | ||
21/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1956. Dep: 26/06/1956. | ||
25/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1956. Dep: 12/10/1956. | ||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. | ||
13/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/11/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959. | ||
23/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61470 from Neville Hill (50B) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |