|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/10/1922 | 28/02/1923 | 124 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1925 | 18/08/1925 | 135 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1928 | 07/05/1928 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1928 | 07/08/1928 | 79 days | General | Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/03/1929 | 28/03/1929 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1931 | 11/12/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1938 | 02/12/1938 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/12/1940 | 31/01/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/08/1945 | 07/09/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1405 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1946 | 12/12/1946 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/12/1947 | 15/01/1948 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1949 | 18/05/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3942 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61405 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1952 | 03/12/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1952 | 30/12/1952 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1955 | 07/05/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24057 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1958 | 09/01/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 845 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 28/02/1923. | ||
15/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
01/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1925. Dep: 18/08/1925. | ||
25/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1928. Dep: 07/05/1928. | ||
21/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1928. Dep: 07/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1929. Dep: 28/03/1929. | ||
14/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
29/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1931. Dep: 11/12/1931. | ||
17/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1938. Dep: 02/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) |
||
26/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1940. Dep: 31/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
24/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1945. Dep: 07/09/1945. | ||
18/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1405 |
||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 12/12/1946. | ||
22/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1947. Dep: 15/01/1948. | ||
16/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1949. Dep: 18/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3942 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61405 |
||
24/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61474 | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. | ||
28/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 03/12/1952. | ||
10/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24057 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
09/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 09/01/1958. | ||
20/01/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61474 from Selby (50C) | ||
03/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |