|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/11/1922 | 27/02/1923 | 118 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/07/1923 | 10/07/1923 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1925 | 04/08/1925 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1926 | 16/03/1927 | 318 days | General | Awaiting new crank axle |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/04/1929 | 14/06/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number D1176 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1932 | 10/05/1932 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1932 | 12/07/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1166 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1932 | 24/08/1932 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1935 | 05/08/1935 | 98 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1938 | 01/04/1938 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1938 | 05/04/1938 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 20 days | General | Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1942 | 21/12/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1945 | 13/06/1945 | 77 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/12/1947 | 20/01/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1949 | 08/07/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61407 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1955 | 04/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1957 | 02/08/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1957 | 27/11/1957 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1961 | 13/04/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1961 | 20/04/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 847 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1922. Dep: 27/02/1923. | ||
03/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1923. Dep: 10/07/1923. | ||
06/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1925. Dep: 04/08/1925. | ||
03/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1926. Dep: 16/03/1927. Work undertaken: Awaiting new crank axle |
||
19/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1929. Dep: 14/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1176 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1932. Dep: 10/05/1932. | ||
01/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1932. Dep: 12/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1166 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1932. Dep: 24/08/1932. | ||
30/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1935. Dep: 05/08/1935. | ||
15/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1938. Dep: 01/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1938. Dep: 05/04/1938. | ||
27/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1942. Dep: 21/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1945. Dep: 13/06/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1407 | ||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A) |
||
30/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1947. Dep: 20/01/1948. | ||
02/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 08/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61407 |
||
24/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61476 | ||
02/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1955. Dep: 04/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 27/11/1957. | ||
06/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1961. Dep: 13/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
16/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61476 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |