|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/02/1923 | 31/05/1923 | 99 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/08/1926 | 18/11/1926 | 100 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1927 | 23/05/1927 | 124 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1930 | 24/11/1930 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1932 | 08/11/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1015 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1936 | 30/09/1936 | 55 days | General | Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1939 | 30/06/1939 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1942 | 10/02/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1945 | 16/03/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1945 | 04/04/1945 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1946 | 23/05/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3452 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1950 | 02/09/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24000 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1953 | 26/02/1953 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24068 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24058 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1960 | 29/01/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 848 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
22/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1923. Dep: 31/05/1923. | ||
11/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1926. Dep: 18/11/1926. | ||
20/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1927. Dep: 23/05/1927. | ||
03/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1930. Dep: 24/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
22/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1932. Dep: 08/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1015 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1936. Dep: 30/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1939. Dep: 30/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
07/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1942. Dep: 10/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
14/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1945. Dep: 16/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1945. Dep: 04/04/1945. | ||
04/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 23/05/1946. | ||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1408 | ||
21/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3452 (Diagram 49A) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61408 but not taken up | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61477 | ||
03/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1950. Dep: 02/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24000 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1953. Dep: 26/02/1953. | ||
13/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24068 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24058 (Diagram 49A) |
||
06/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. | ||
29/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/01/1960. Dep: 29/01/1960. | ||
02/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61477 from York (North) (50A) |