|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 04/07/1924 | 01/10/1924 | 90 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1927 | 09/01/1928 | 111 days | General | Boiler number D980 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1930 | 01/09/1930 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1931 | 15/05/1931 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1449 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1933 | 21/08/1933 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1935 | 28/02/1935 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1936 | 01/03/1937 | 71 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1937 | 01/12/1937 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1939 | 18/09/1939 | 50 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1939 | 22/09/1939 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1940 | 03/05/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1942 | 27/11/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1945 | 12/07/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/10/1946 | 14/11/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1413 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1948 | 07/05/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61413 |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1949 | 03/01/1950 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1951 | 26/01/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24045 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24100 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1955 | 24/01/1955 | 14 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1956 | 02/06/1956 | 4 days | Special | Tender change |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1956 | 22/06/1956 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24008 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1960 | 20/08/1960 | 96 days | General | Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
17/12/1960 | Mirfield MPD | From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. | SLS/196102 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 911 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
04/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1924. Dep: 01/10/1924. | ||
22/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1927. Dep: 09/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D980 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 01/09/1930. | ||
31/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1931. Dep: 15/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1449 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
06/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1933. Dep: 21/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
14/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1935. Dep: 28/02/1935. | ||
21/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1936. Dep: 01/03/1937. | ||
15/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1937. Dep: 01/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/07/1939. Dep: 18/09/1939. | ||
20/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1939. Dep: 22/09/1939. | ||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 03/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1942. Dep: 27/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
12/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1945. Dep: 12/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
24/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1946. Dep: 14/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1413 |
||
24/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
03/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61413 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
25/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1949. Dep: 03/01/1950. | ||
27/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1951. Dep: 26/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24045 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24100 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 24/01/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 02/06/1956. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
13/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1956. Dep: 22/06/1956. | ||
25/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24008 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
17/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1960. Dep: 20/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61413 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |