|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 08/04/1924 | 17/07/1924 | 101 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/07/1928 | 04/10/1928 | 70 days | General | Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1931 | 16/09/1931 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/09/1932 | 03/10/1932 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1583 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1936 | 18/04/1936 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1936 | 01/12/1936 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1937 | 08/10/1937 | 54 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1938 | 02/09/1938 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1938 | 19/09/1938 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1944 | 21/03/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/10/1945 | 19/10/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1950 | 01/07/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61416 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1950 | 06/07/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1953 | 23/05/1953 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1956 | 18/06/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1956 | 29/06/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1959 | 18/09/1959 | 33 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/01/1948 | Rossington | 'A.3' No. 63 Isinglass was hauling the northbound empty wagon train which became partly derailed just south of Rossington on 17/1. The breakdown vans were worked out from Doncaster by 'B.16' No. 1416 | SLS/194803 |
17/12/1960 | Mirfield MPD | From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. | SLS/196102 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 920 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
08/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1924. Dep: 17/07/1924. | ||
27/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1928. Dep: 04/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1931. Dep: 16/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1932. Dep: 03/10/1932. | ||
06/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1583 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936. | ||
29/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
11/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1936. Dep: 01/12/1936. | ||
16/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/08/1937. Dep: 08/10/1937. | ||
20/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1938. Dep: 02/09/1938. | ||
05/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/09/1938. Dep: 19/09/1938. | ||
03/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
25/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1944. Dep: 21/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1945. Dep: 19/10/1945. | ||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1416 | ||
13/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61416 |
||
03/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1950. Dep: 06/07/1950. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
24/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. | ||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. | ||
16/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1956. Dep: 18/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49) |
||
25/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1956. Dep: 29/06/1956. | ||
17/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959. | ||
19/09/1959 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24024 boiler fitted | ||
19/09/1959 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3055 boiler fitted | ||
11/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
05/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
12/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61416 from Mirfield (56D) |