Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 387 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4879 Week
» 29713 Month
» 64045 Year
» 1729421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 923 m/e 11/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1419   13/12/1946
British Railways 61419   22/09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 16/10/61

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
YK   York (North) (New) m/e 11/1920
SCA   Scarborough on 14/05/1928
YK   York (North) on 03/10/1929
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
YK   York (North) on 04/12/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
50B   Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50B   Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
50A   York (North) on 17/02/1952
50A   York (North) 4w/e 23/02/1952
50C   Selby on 30/06/1957
50A   York (North) on 15/09/1957
     Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1149)
12/09/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1564)
18/05/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2266)
24/01/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1172)
02/05/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1667)
22/03/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1622)
05/02/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1535)
12/07/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3448)
22/09/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24031)
25/09/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24022)
11/05/1957 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24043)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 21/03/1923 13/06/1923 85 days General    
Darlington Works 08/12/1925 24/03/1926 107 days General    
Darlington Works 16/05/1927 27/09/1927 135 days General    
Darlington Works 06/06/1929 12/09/1929 99 days General Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/09/1929 25/09/1929 7 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 08/01/1930 18/01/1930 11 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 11/04/1932 18/05/1932 38 days General Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 10/12/1935 24/01/1936 46 days General Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/12/1937 24/02/1938 78 days Heavy    
Darlington Works 02/03/1939 02/05/1939 62 days General Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/07/1940 29/07/1940 27 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 27/11/1940 14/12/1940 18 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 04/02/1941 22/03/1941 47 days Heavy Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/07/1942 11/09/1942 68 days General    
Darlington Works 13/01/1944 05/02/1944 24 days General Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/06/1947 12/07/1947 30 days General Boiler number 3448 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1951 22/09/1951 26 days General Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61419
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1951 25/09/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 12/08/1954 25/09/1954 45 days General Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/09/1954 28/09/1954 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 16/04/1957 11/05/1957 26 days General Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108
26/08/1961 York South York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. SLS/196110
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Road) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Road) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205
14/07/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 923
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
21/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1923. Dep: 13/06/1923.    
08/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1925. Dep: 24/03/1926.    
16/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1927. Dep: 27/09/1927.    
14/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
06/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1929. Dep: 12/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
   
19/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1929. Dep: 25/09/1929.    
03/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1930. Dep: 18/01/1930.    
11/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1932. Dep: 18/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
   
10/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1935. Dep: 24/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49)
   
09/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1937. Dep: 24/02/1938.    
02/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 02/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49)
   
03/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 29/07/1940.    
27/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.    
04/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49)
   
06/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 11/09/1942.    
13/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
   
13/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1419    
13/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3448 (Diagram 49A)
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
28/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61419
   
24/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951.    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
12/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 28/09/1954.    
16/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49)
   
30/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61419 from York (North) (50A)    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev