Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 35 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5592 Week
» 16737 Month
» 116522 Year
» 1781898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 924 m/e 12/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1420   25/09/1946
British Railways 61420   23/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/112/1920
B16/3 (4-6-0)13/10/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1920 to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Withdrawal Mon 23/09/1963 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Service Life 42 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sun 02/02/1964 at Drapers (Hull)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A. Draper, Hull, 11/63. Cut up 2/2/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
TWD   Tweedmouth (New) m/e 12/1920
YK   York (North) on 08/05/1924
NEV   Neville Hill on 07/07/1925
YK   York (North) on 28/03/1943
50B   Hull Dairycoates on 02/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 23/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   on 23/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1166)
20/02/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1117)
05/10/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1449)
01/03/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2877)
12/02/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2264)
13/10/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3587)
23/04/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3579)
14/10/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24003)
20/06/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24005)
25/06/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24071)
14/12/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24041)
21/09/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24012)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gateshead Works 02/11/1923 12/01/1924 72 days General    
Darlington Works 30/11/1926 12/04/1927 134 days General    
Darlington Works 30/12/1929 20/02/1930 53 days General Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/08/1933 05/10/1933 43 days General Boiler number D1449 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/12/1936 01/03/1937 83 days General Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 18/08/1938 29/09/1938 43 days General    
Darlington Works 08/01/1941 12/02/1941 36 days General Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 07/09/1943 23/10/1943 47 days General    
Darlington Works 16/08/1945 13/10/1945 59 days General Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3587 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1945 22/10/1945 3 days Unclassified    
Gateshead Works 12/09/1946 30/09/1946 19 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1420
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1948 23/04/1948 52 days General Boiler number 3579 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61420
 
Darlington Works 03/07/1948 16/07/1948 14 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 05/01/1950 16/01/1950 12 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 18/09/1950 14/10/1950 27 days General Boiler number 24003 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 16/10/1950 17/10/1950 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 03/11/1952 05/11/1952 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 25/05/1953 20/06/1953 27 days General Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 23/06/1953 23/06/1953 1 day Unclassified    
Darlington Works 26/05/1955 25/06/1955 31 days General Boiler number 24071 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 06/12/1955 23/12/1955 18 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 21/11/1957 14/12/1957 24 days General Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 16/12/1957 18/12/1957 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 15/08/1960 21/09/1960 38 days General Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1962 31/08/1962 2 days Special Tender change
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 924
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
02/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924.    
08/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
07/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
30/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1926. Dep: 12/04/1927.    
30/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1929. Dep: 20/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49)
   
24/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1933. Dep: 05/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1449 (Diagram 49)
   
09/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1936. Dep: 01/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49)
   
18/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1938. Dep: 29/09/1938.    
08/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1941. Dep: 12/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
07/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943.    
16/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3587 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 22/10/1945.    
12/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 30/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1420
   
03/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3579 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61420
   
03/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948.    
05/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1950. Dep: 16/01/1950.    
18/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24003 (Diagram 49A)
   
16/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950.    
03/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952.    
25/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A)
   
23/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 23/06/1953.    
26/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24071 (Diagram 49A)
   
06/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955.    
21/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A)
   
16/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 18/12/1957.    
15/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1960. Dep: 21/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A)
   
30/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 30/08/1962. Dep: 31/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Tender change
   
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
23/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61420 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
02/02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev