Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 409 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1478 Week
» 1478 Month
» 68340 Year
» 1733716 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 925 m/e 12/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Sat 13/06/1942 off York (North) (YK)
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys
Information This locomotive was destroyed by enemy action on York shed on 28/29 April 1942 - one of the Baedecker raids. A4 4469 was also destroyed.

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
YK   York (North) (New) m/e 12/1920
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 25/11/1927
SCA   Scarborough on 01/06/1939
YK   York (North) on 25/05/1940
     Withdrawn on 13/06/1942

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1172)
18/01/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1587)
01/11/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1502)
07/07/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1628)
06/09/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1499)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 26/08/1923 26/10/1923 62 days General    
Darlington Works 18/07/1924 15/08/1924 29 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 28/03/1927 01/08/1927 127 days General    
Darlington Works 20/11/1929 18/01/1930 60 days General Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/09/1932 01/11/1932 34 days General Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 12/03/1935 13/05/1935 63 days General    
Darlington Works 24/05/1937 07/07/1937 45 days General Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/10/1937 24/12/1937 73 days Heavy    
Darlington Works 26/07/1940 06/09/1940 43 days General Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 21/05/1941 08/07/1941 49 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 20/05/1942 20/05/1942 1 day No repairs In for bomb damage
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 925
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
26/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1923. Dep: 26/10/1923.    
18/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1924. Dep: 15/08/1924.    
28/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1927. Dep: 01/08/1927.    
25/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
20/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
   
29/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1932. Dep: 01/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49)
   
12/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1935. Dep: 13/05/1935.    
24/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1937. Dep: 07/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
   
13/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937.    
01/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
25/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
26/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1940. Dep: 06/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49)
   
21/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1941. Dep: 08/07/1941.    
20/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/05/1942. Dep: 20/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
In for bomb damage
   
13/06/1942 Withdrawn Condemned as 925 from York (North) (YK)    

prev prev