Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 926 m/e 12/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1421   20/10/1946
British Railways 61421   15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/112/1920
B16/2 (4-6-0)23/03/1940
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1920 to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow, Blyth, 9/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
TWD   Tweedmouth (New) m/e 12/1920
YK   York (North) on 22/07/1929
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1176)
16/04/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1472)
07/04/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1149)
02/06/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1591)
23/03/1940 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3049)
01/08/1942 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3263)
13/06/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2883)
04/09/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2773)
15/01/1949 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2728)
15/12/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24042)
08/04/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24015)
12/04/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24077)
06/08/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24034)
10/11/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24009)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gateshead Works 29/08/1923 06/11/1923 70 days General    
Gateshead Works 19/02/1926 23/02/1926 5 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 15/07/1926 11/02/1927 212 days General    
Gateshead Works 11/06/1927 15/06/1927 5 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 20/07/1928 03/08/1928 15 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 28/11/1928 04/12/1928 7 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 21/02/1929 16/04/1929 55 days General Boiler number D1472 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 29/01/1932 11/02/1932 14 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 14/02/1933 07/04/1933 53 days General Boiler number D1149 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1935 14/06/1935 53 days General    
Darlington Works 20/04/1937 02/06/1937 44 days General Boiler number D1591 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/11/1939 23/03/1940 118 days General Rebuilt to class B16/2
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 15/06/1942 01/08/1942 48 days General Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 23/03/1945 13/06/1945 83 days General Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/06/1945 13/07/1945 15 days Light Repair Water scoop refitted
 
Darlington Works 02/08/1946 04/09/1946 34 days General Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 21/09/1947 09/10/1947 19 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 17/12/1948 15/01/1949 30 days General Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61421
 
Darlington Works 22/11/1951 15/12/1951 24 days General Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/12/1951 21/12/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 05/03/1954 08/04/1954 35 days General Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1956 12/04/1956 35 days General Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 18/06/1958 06/08/1958 50 days General Boiler number 24034 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/01/1959 28/01/1959 16 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 04/10/1961 10/11/1961 38 days General Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 926
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
29/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1923. Dep: 06/11/1923.    
19/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1926. Dep: 23/02/1926.    
15/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1926. Dep: 11/02/1927.    
11/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 15/06/1927.    
20/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1928. Dep: 03/08/1928.    
28/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1928. Dep: 04/12/1928.    
21/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1929. Dep: 16/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1472 (Diagram 49)
   
22/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
29/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1932. Dep: 11/02/1932.    
14/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1933. Dep: 07/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1149 (Diagram 49)
   
23/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1935. Dep: 14/06/1935.    
20/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1937. Dep: 02/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1591 (Diagram 49)
   
27/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 23/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/2
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
   
15/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A)
   
23/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1945. Dep: 13/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49)
   
29/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1945. Dep: 13/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop refitted
   
02/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1946. Dep: 04/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
   
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1421    
21/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947.    
17/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61421
   
22/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951.    
05/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 08/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A)
   
09/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1956. Dep: 12/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A)
   
18/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1958. Dep: 06/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24034 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1959. Dep: 28/01/1959.    
04/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1961. Dep: 10/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61421 from York (North) (50A)    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev