Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1038 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4741 Week
» 3479 Month
» 417800 Year
» 1639365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 927 m/e 12/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1422   22/12/1946
British Railways 61422   31/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 12/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 16/10/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 12/1920
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50C Selby on 07/06/1953
50A York (North) on 29/05/1955
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 18/06/1955
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1179)
11/02/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1117)
08/02/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1172)
12/05/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2264)
10/01/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1038)
08/10/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1125)
20/06/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1614)
15/04/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2694)
09/05/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1610)
31/03/1949 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2773)
27/02/1956 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24068)
04/09/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24047)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 13/07/1925 28/11/1925 139 days General  
Darlington Works 12/11/1927 11/02/1928 92 days General
Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/12/1929 08/02/1930 62 days General
Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/04/1933 12/05/1933 40 days General
Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 18/11/1935 10/01/1936 54 days General
Boiler number D1038 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1937 08/10/1937 88 days General
Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 12/05/1939 03/08/1939 84 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 27/05/1940 20/06/1940 25 days General
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1941 04/03/1941 27 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 09/09/1942 24/09/1942 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 17/07/1943 14/08/1943 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/03/1944 15/04/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 05/11/1945 24/11/1945 20 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/03/1946 09/05/1946 42 days General
Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1947 23/10/1947 48 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/03/1949 31/03/1949 24 days General
Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61422
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1951 24/08/1951 16 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 22/05/1952 21/06/1952 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 21/10/1953 15/12/1953 56 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 22/12/1953 23/12/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/01/1954 11/01/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/09/1954 13/11/1954 72 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 26/01/1956 27/02/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 24068 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/08/1956 26/11/1956 92 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 04/08/1959 04/09/1959 32 days General
Boiler number 24047 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1959 17/09/1959 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/05/1960 21/06/1960 44 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
28/11/1953 Darlington Works North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 927
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1422    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
29/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61422 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev