Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 943 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7460 Week
» 7460 Month
» 74322 Year
» 1739698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 932 m/e 03/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1427   04/01/1947
British Railways 61427   10/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1921 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1960 off Neville Hill (55H)
Service Life 39 yrs , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
HTN   Heaton (New) m/e 03/1921
BLA   Blaydon on 01/07/1924
YK   York (North) on 30/09/1937
NEV   Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
     Withdrawn on 07/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 07/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1204)
27/08/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1111)
28/06/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1564)
17/12/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1201)
28/07/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1559)
09/11/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2265)
17/11/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1434)
04/01/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3439)
10/02/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3265)
05/09/1953 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24083)
26/03/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24080)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gateshead Works 10/11/1924 23/01/1925 75 days General    
Gateshead Works 12/06/1928 27/08/1928 77 days General Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1932 28/06/1932 42 days General Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 07/07/1932 12/07/1932 6 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 12/08/1932 01/09/1932 21 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 02/10/1934 17/12/1934 77 days General Boiler number D1201 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/06/1937 28/07/1937 51 days General Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/09/1939 09/11/1939 42 days General Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 14/10/1942 17/11/1942 35 days General Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 08/11/1944 15/12/1944 38 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 28/11/1946 04/01/1947 38 days General Boiler number 3439 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1427
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1950 10/02/1950 40 days General Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61427
 
Darlington Works 14/11/1951 16/11/1951 3 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 07/08/1953 05/09/1953 30 days General Boiler number 24083 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/11/1954 21/12/1954 33 days Heavy Casual    
Darlington Works 24/02/1956 26/03/1956 32 days General Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/03/1960 04/03/1960 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 932
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
01/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
10/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1924. Dep: 23/01/1925.    
12/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1928. Dep: 27/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49)
   
18/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 28/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
   
07/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1932. Dep: 12/07/1932.    
12/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1932. Dep: 01/09/1932.    
02/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1934. Dep: 17/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1201 (Diagram 49)
   
08/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1937. Dep: 28/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
   
30/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
29/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1939. Dep: 09/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
   
14/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1942. Dep: 17/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49)
   
08/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1944. Dep: 15/12/1944.    
28/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3439 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1427
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 10/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61427
   
14/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1951. Dep: 16/11/1951.    
07/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24083 (Diagram 49)
   
19/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1954. Dep: 21/12/1954.    
24/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 26/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
04/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/03/1960. Dep: 04/03/1960.    
07/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61427 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev