|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/08/1923 | 26/10/1923 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1927 | 20/05/1927 | 121 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/02/1929 | 15/02/1929 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/08/1929 | 25/10/1929 | 75 days | General | Boiler number D998 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1933 | 24/07/1933 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1936 | 17/07/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1938 | 13/02/1939 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1941 | 16/05/1941 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D1595 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1942 | 10/11/1942 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3448 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1946 | 08/02/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/02/1946 | 05/03/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3580 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/10/1948 | 10/11/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61428 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24016 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1951 | 06/03/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 54 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1954 | 26/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24008 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1957 | 23/03/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24050 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1957 | 26/03/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1957 | 05/04/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1959 | 14/09/1959 | 6 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 933 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1923. Dep: 26/10/1923. | ||
20/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1927. Dep: 20/05/1927. | ||
22/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
04/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1929. Dep: 15/02/1929. | ||
09/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1929. Dep: 25/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D998 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1933. Dep: 24/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1936. Dep: 17/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1938. Dep: 13/02/1939. | ||
09/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1941. Dep: 16/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1595 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1942. Dep: 10/11/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
31/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3448 (Diagram 49A) |
||
24/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1946. Dep: 08/02/1946. | ||
14/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1946. Dep: 05/03/1946. | ||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1428 | ||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3580 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1948. Dep: 10/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61428 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
07/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24016 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1951. Dep: 06/03/1951. | ||
26/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. | ||
24/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24008 (Diagram 49) |
||
26/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24050 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1957. Dep: 26/03/1957. | ||
02/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1957. Dep: 05/04/1957. | ||
09/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1959. Dep: 14/09/1959. | ||
31/10/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61428 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |