|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/10/1923 | 23/01/1924 | 90 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1927 | 12/08/1927 | 105 days | General | Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1930 | 30/10/1930 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1931 | 09/10/1931 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1933 | 20/01/1934 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1934 | 03/01/1935 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1935 | 16/10/1935 | 106 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1936 | 27/11/1936 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1936 | 29/12/1936 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1940 | 17/02/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1940 | 19/06/1940 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1942 | 21/08/1942 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1945 | 08/08/1945 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/08/1946 | 06/09/1946 | 19 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1430 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1948 | 03/09/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61430 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1954 | 11/11/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1957 | 25/01/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 936 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
26/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1923. Dep: 23/01/1924. | ||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 12/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1930. Dep: 30/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931. | ||
12/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1934. Dep: 03/01/1935. | ||
03/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/07/1935. Dep: 16/10/1935. | ||
08/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1936. Dep: 27/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1936. Dep: 29/12/1936. | ||
17/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 19/06/1940. | ||
03/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1942. Dep: 21/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1945. Dep: 08/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
19/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 06/09/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1430 |
||
20/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. | ||
27/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61430 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
02/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1954. Dep: 11/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1957. Dep: 25/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
01/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61430 from York (North) (50A) |