|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/09/1924 | 21/12/1924 | 98 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1927 | 18/11/1927 | 159 days | General | Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1928 | 21/12/1928 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1929 | 18/03/1929 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/01/1930 | 08/01/1930 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/02/1930 | 18/03/1930 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1932 | 30/08/1932 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1934 | 20/08/1934 | 55 days | General | Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1936 | 31/03/1936 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1938 | 19/12/1938 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1938 | 04/01/1939 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1948 | 13/02/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1431 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1948 | 01/03/1948 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 20 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 61431 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 24025 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1953 | 27/11/1953 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1954 | 21/01/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1956 | 05/12/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24087 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1957 | 13/09/1957 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 937 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
15/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 21/12/1924. | ||
13/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1927. Dep: 18/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1928. Dep: 21/12/1928. | ||
26/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1929. Dep: 18/03/1929. | ||
03/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1930. Dep: 08/01/1930. | ||
05/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1930. Dep: 18/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
13/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1932. Dep: 30/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1934. Dep: 20/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1936. Dep: 31/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1938. Dep: 04/01/1939. | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1431 | ||
08/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1431 |
||
24/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 01/03/1948. | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61431 |
||
28/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24025 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1953. Dep: 27/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
05/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 21/01/1954. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24087 (Diagram 49A) |
||
30/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 13/09/1957. | ||
14/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61431 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |