Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 538 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 538 Week
» 8150 Month
» 75012 Year
» 1740388 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2363 m/e 11/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1434   20/10/1946
British Railways 61434   27/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/111/1922
B16/3 (4-6-0)29/04/1949
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1922 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 41 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow Blyth, 9/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GHD   Gateshead (New) m/e 11/1922
YK   York (North) on 31/05/1937
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1922 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1434)
01/12/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1591)
14/04/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1529)
31/05/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1184)
13/02/1943 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2265)
27/04/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3033)
29/04/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3950)
05/01/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24044)
26/06/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24021)
31/08/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24086)
14/11/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24002)
13/01/1962 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24074)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gateshead Works 14/01/1926 15/10/1926 275 days General    
Darlington Works 25/11/1926 28/01/1927 65 days Light Repair    
Gateshead Works 29/04/1929 17/07/1929 80 days General    
Darlington Works 26/09/1929 07/10/1929 12 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 25/10/1932 01/12/1932 38 days General Boiler number D1591 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/04/1933 13/04/1933 11 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 20/11/1934 19/01/1935 61 days General    
Darlington Works 23/02/1937 14/04/1937 51 days General Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1937 13/12/1937 28 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 04/01/1939 20/02/1939 48 days Light Repair After collision
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1939 01/09/1939 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 01/05/1940 31/05/1940 31 days General Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/10/1941 22/10/1941 20 days Light Repair After collision
 
Darlington Works 27/03/1942 04/04/1942 9 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 12/01/1943 13/02/1943 33 days General Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1943 12/04/1943 25 days Heavy Blow between steam chest and middle cylinders
 
Gateshead Works 21/12/1944 11/01/1945 22 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 19/03/1946 27/04/1946 40 days General Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/05/1946 11/05/1946 8 days Unclassified    
Gateshead Works 04/07/1947 08/08/1947 36 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 30/04/1948 27/05/1948 28 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 61434
 
Darlington Works 25/03/1949 29/04/1949 36 days General Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3950 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 02/05/1949 12/05/1949 11 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 18/05/1949 14/06/1949 28 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 06/12/1951 05/01/1952 31 days General Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 01/07/1952 12/07/1952 12 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 28/05/1954 26/06/1954 30 days General Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1955 17/07/1955 5 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 12/07/1956 31/08/1956 51 days General Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/10/1958 14/11/1958 33 days General Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/12/1961 13/01/1962 41 days General Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2363
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
14/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1926. Dep: 15/10/1926.    
25/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1926. Dep: 28/01/1927.    
29/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1929. Dep: 17/07/1929.    
26/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1929. Dep: 07/10/1929.    
25/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1932. Dep: 01/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1591 (Diagram 49)
   
03/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933.    
20/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1934. Dep: 19/01/1935.    
23/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1937. Dep: 14/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49)
   
31/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
16/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1937. Dep: 13/12/1937.    
04/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1939. Dep: 20/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
30/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1939. Dep: 01/09/1939.    
01/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1940. Dep: 31/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49)
   
03/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1941. Dep: 22/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
27/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942.    
12/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
   
19/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/03/1943. Dep: 12/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Blow between steam chest and middle cylinders
   
21/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1944. Dep: 11/01/1945.    
19/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1434    
04/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 08/08/1947.    
30/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1948. Dep: 27/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61434
   
25/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1949. Dep: 29/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3950 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1949. Dep: 12/05/1949.    
18/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1949. Dep: 14/06/1949.    
06/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 05/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A)
   
01/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1952. Dep: 12/07/1952.    
28/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1955. Dep: 17/07/1955.    
12/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1956. Dep: 31/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1961. Dep: 13/01/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61434 from York (North) (50A)    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev