Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 814 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6741 Week
» 5479 Month
» 419800 Year
» 1641365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2364 m/e 11/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1435   10/12/1946
British Railways 61435   11/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/111/1922
B16/224/06/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1922 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Tue 21/07/1964 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Scrapping Mon 02/11/1964 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 9/64. Cut up 2/11/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 11/1922
50B Hull Dairycoates on 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 21/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   on 21/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1922 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1438)
07/09/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1029)
05/06/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1133)
03/04/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1529)
06/05/1941 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3165)
16/03/1943 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3049)
15/09/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3263)
07/11/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3164)
09/09/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24001)
23/01/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24058)
11/03/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24028)
06/07/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24031)
05/11/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24088)
14/03/1963 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24101)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 17/07/1925 30/11/1925 137 days General  
Darlington Works 22/06/1928 07/09/1928 78 days General
Boiler number D1029 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 18/02/1930 08/03/1930 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/06/1930 27/06/1930 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/04/1931 05/06/1931 53 days General
Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1934 03/04/1934 33 days General
Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 21/02/1936 09/04/1936 49 days General  
Darlington Works 11/01/1937 24/06/1937 165 days General
Rebuilt to class B16/2
Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 04/11/1938 15/11/1938 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/04/1939 12/06/1939 52 days General  
Darlington Works 13/06/1939 01/07/1939 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/03/1941 06/05/1941 44 days General
Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1943 16/03/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1945 15/09/1945 38 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 07/03/1946 22/03/1946 16 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 30/08/1946 19/09/1946 21 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 03/10/1947 07/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 20/12/1948 11/01/1949 23 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61435
 
Darlington Works 15/08/1950 09/09/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1950 12/09/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/12/1952 23/01/1953 37 days General
Boiler number 24058 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/01/1953 10/02/1953 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/02/1955 11/03/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1957 06/07/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 02/10/1959 05/11/1959 35 days General
Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 05/02/1963 14/03/1963 38 days General
Boiler number 24101 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/04/1963 11/04/1963 1 day Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/07/1957 Darlington Works On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. SLS/195709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2364
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
10/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1435    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
21/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61435 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    

prev prev