Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 764 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6691 Week
» 5429 Month
» 419750 Year
» 1641315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2365 m/e 12/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1436   28/09/1946
British Railways 61436   15/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1922 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961
Scrapping During 03/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 7/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) m/e 12/1922
BLA Blaydon m/e 01/1925
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 30/09/1937
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 17/02/1952
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1922 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1442)
29/09/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1588)
15/12/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1461)
10/11/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1243)
29/06/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2881)
24/12/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2884)
28/09/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2694)
15/09/1949 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2558)
10/12/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24074)
11/01/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24069)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 08/10/1925 23/12/1925 77 days General  
Gateshead Works 28/06/1927 16/09/1927 81 days General  
Darlington Works 07/07/1930 29/09/1930 85 days General
Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 30/10/1931 12/11/1931 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/11/1933 15/12/1933 44 days General
Boiler number D1461 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1936 10/11/1936 49 days General
Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/11/1936 17/12/1936 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/10/1938 03/01/1939 90 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 02/06/1940 29/06/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/11/1942 24/12/1942 32 days General
Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 12/11/1944 24/11/1944 13 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/08/1946 28/09/1946 30 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1436
 
Gateshead Works 09/12/1947 24/12/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 19/08/1949 15/09/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61436
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1949 30/09/1949 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/05/1951 31/05/1951 11 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1953 25/04/1953 48 days General
Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/04/1953 01/05/1953 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/11/1955 10/12/1955 31 days General
Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 19/12/1955 23/12/1955 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/12/1957 11/01/1958 23 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 24069 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 06/10/1958 12/11/1958 38 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2365
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
30/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61436    

prev prev