|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1926 | 28/12/1926 | 289 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1929 | 16/09/1929 | 68 days | General | Standard buffers & hook |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1934 | 02/03/1934 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D1480 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1935 | 03/12/1935 | 16 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1015 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1936 | 31/03/1937 | 114 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1939 | 28/02/1939 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1939 | 15/11/1939 | 87 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/2 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1942 | 13/02/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1944 | 24/08/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/10/1945 | 15/11/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/09/1948 | 16/09/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61438 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1950 | 17/02/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3970 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1950 | 23/02/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1951 | 05/12/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24036 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1954 | 12/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1956 | 16/04/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1956 | 25/05/1956 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1958 | 26/04/1958 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24109 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1961 | 03/11/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1962 | 12/07/1962 | 38 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/01/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2367 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1176 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1926. Dep: 28/12/1926. | ||
11/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1929. Dep: 16/09/1929. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook |
||
30/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
24/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1934. Dep: 02/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1480 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
18/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 03/12/1935. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
19/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1015 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/12/1936. Dep: 31/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 28/02/1939. | ||
21/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1939. Dep: 15/11/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/2 |
||
14/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1942. Dep: 13/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
15/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. | ||
26/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1944. Dep: 24/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
26/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1945. Dep: 15/11/1945. | ||
06/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1438 | ||
27/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1948. Dep: 16/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61438 |
||
11/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1950. Dep: 17/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3970 (Diagram 49A) |
||
22/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1950. Dep: 23/02/1950. | ||
08/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1951. Dep: 05/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24036 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1954. Dep: 12/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 16/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1956. Dep: 25/05/1956. | ||
31/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24109 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
31/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1961. Dep: 03/11/1961. | ||
14/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. | ||
05/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 12/07/1962. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61438 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
05/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |