|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 25/05/1926 | 04/01/1927 | 225 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1930 | 30/06/1930 | 88 days | General | Boiler number D1166 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1932 | 01/06/1932 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1934 | 27/11/1934 | 48 days | General | Cab side screens fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1937 | 19/03/1937 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1938 | 01/12/1938 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1941 | 05/01/1942 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 73 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3577 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1945 | 24/08/1945 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/07/1946 | 07/08/1946 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3492 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/01/1949 | 28/01/1949 | 13 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61439 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1953 | 31/01/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1953 | 04/02/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1953 | 24/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1953 | 25/03/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1954 | 26/01/1954 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1958 | 18/03/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1960 | 21/04/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/02/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2368 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1177 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
30/05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
01/09/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1926. Dep: 04/01/1927. | ||
04/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1930. Dep: 30/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1166 (Diagram 49) |
||
26/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1932. Dep: 01/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
11/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1934. Dep: 27/11/1934. Work undertaken: Cab side screens fitted |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 19/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
21/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1938. Dep: 01/12/1938. | ||
04/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1941. Dep: 05/01/1942. | ||
24/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3577 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 24/08/1945. | ||
08/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1946. Dep: 07/08/1946. | ||
10/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1439 | ||
13/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3492 (Diagram 49A) |
||
16/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1949. Dep: 28/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61439 |
||
22/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A) |
||
07/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 04/02/1953. | ||
11/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. | ||
18/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1953. Dep: 24/02/1953. | ||
25/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/03/1953. Dep: 25/03/1953. | ||
06/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1954. Dep: 26/01/1954. | ||
30/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 18/03/1958. | ||
15/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1960. Dep: 21/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61439 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |