|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 21/10/1926 | 18/02/1927 | 121 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1928 | 29/11/1928 | 74 days | General | Anti-vacuum valve fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/04/1930 | 15/04/1930 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1930 | 09/02/1931 | 56 days | General | Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1113 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/04/1931 | 22/04/1931 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1931 | 29/10/1931 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1934 | 13/08/1934 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D1582 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1936 | 08/12/1936 | 57 days | General | Boiler number D1450 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1938 | 30/03/1938 | 86 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1940 | 24/05/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D1201 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1941 | 14/02/1941 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1945 | 07/09/1945 | 56 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1946 | 03/07/1946 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 06/09/1947 | 25/09/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1948 | 04/06/1948 | 42 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61440 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1949 | 06/10/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1952 | 17/07/1952 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1956 | 15/08/1956 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1957 | 28/06/1957 | 26 days | Light Casual | Afer collision |
||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1957 | 28/11/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1957 | 30/12/1957 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1960 | 08/08/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/03/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2369 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1178 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1926. Dep: 18/02/1927. | ||
17/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1928. Dep: 29/11/1928. Work undertaken: Anti-vacuum valve fitted |
||
02/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/04/1930. Dep: 15/04/1930. | ||
16/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1930. Dep: 09/02/1931. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1113 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1931. Dep: 22/04/1931. | ||
28/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1931. Dep: 29/10/1931. | ||
23/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 13/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1582 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
13/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1936. Dep: 08/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1450 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/01/1938. Dep: 30/03/1938. | ||
23/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1940. Dep: 24/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1201 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
16/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1941. Dep: 14/02/1941. | ||
08/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. | ||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 07/09/1945. | ||
06/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1946. Dep: 03/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1440 | ||
06/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1947. Dep: 25/09/1947. | ||
24/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 04/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61440 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 06/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1952. Dep: 17/07/1952. | ||
18/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
29/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1956. Dep: 15/08/1956. | ||
03/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 28/06/1957. Work undertaken: Afer collision |
||
01/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 28/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 30/12/1957. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 08/08/1960. | ||
15/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61440 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |