Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 738 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6665 Week
» 5403 Month
» 419724 Year
» 1641289 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2371 on 28/03/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1442   05/05/1946
British Railways 61442   26/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 28/03/1923 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 01/02/1960 off Neville Hill (55H)
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 36 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) on 28/03/1923
YK York (North) on 23/06/1931
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
50D Starbeck on 07/06/1953
50B Neville Hill on 01/05/1955
   Withdrawn on 01/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 50D Starbeck 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 21/05/1955
WDN   w/e 01/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/03/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1472)
04/04/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1529)
16/02/1934 Cab side screens fitted
16/02/1934 Steam Brake fitted
16/02/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1038)
29/11/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2694)
22/04/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2557)
05/02/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2702)
25/03/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2878)
14/12/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3167)
22/04/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3495)
18/04/1953 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24078)
31/05/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24001)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 14/12/1925 17/03/1926 94 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/01/1929 04/04/1929 78 days General
Standard buffers & hook. Vacuum elbow fitted
Boiler number D1529 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/10/1929 11/11/1929 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/11/1931 14/12/1931 27 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/01/1934 16/02/1934 40 days General
Boiler number D1038 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 18/10/1935 29/11/1935 43 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1938 22/04/1938 52 days General
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/01/1941 05/02/1941 36 days General
Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1944 25/03/1944 23 days General
Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 29/07/1945 15/08/1945 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/11/1946 14/12/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 13/01/1948 30/01/1948 18 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 10/11/1948 26/11/1948 17 days Light Repair
Cab damage
Renumbered to BR 61442
 
Darlington Works 17/03/1950 22/04/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 3495 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1953 18/04/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/04/1953 22/04/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/04/1956 31/05/1956 49 days General
Boiler number 24001 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/06/1956 22/06/1956 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/08/1958 29/08/1958 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 29/01/1960 29/01/1960 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2371
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
23/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
05/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1442    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (50D)    
01/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
01/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61442 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev