|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/06/1925 | 25/09/1925 | 89 days | General | Shorter chimney fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1925 | 02/11/1925 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1928 | 23/06/1928 | 60 days | General | Anti-vacuum valve fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1929 | 09/08/1929 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1931 | 05/05/1931 | 48 days | General | Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1933 | 12/01/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1935 | 20/01/1936 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1936 | 13/11/1936 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1938 | 19/04/1938 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1938 | 29/04/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1939 | 24/01/1940 | 50 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1940 | 03/12/1940 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1942 | 04/03/1942 | 33 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1947 | 17/02/1947 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/09/1948 | 05/10/1948 | 29 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61443 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/05/1952 | 28/05/1952 | 14 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1953 | 11/02/1954 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1956 | 08/08/1956 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 42 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1959 | 28/08/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/04/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2372 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1181 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
29/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1925. Dep: 25/09/1925. Work undertaken: Shorter chimney fitted |
||
19/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1925. Dep: 02/11/1925. | ||
25/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928. Work undertaken: Anti-vacuum valve fitted |
||
30/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1929. Dep: 09/08/1929. | ||
19/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1931. Dep: 05/05/1931. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1933. Dep: 12/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
26/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1935. Dep: 20/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936. | ||
28/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 19/04/1938. | ||
20/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1938. Dep: 29/04/1938. | ||
06/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/12/1939. Dep: 24/01/1940. | ||
09/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1940. Dep: 03/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 04/03/1942. | ||
06/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1443 | ||
14/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 17/02/1947. | ||
07/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/09/1948. Dep: 05/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61443 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
01/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
15/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
22/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1953. Dep: 11/02/1954. | ||
20/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1956. Dep: 08/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. | ||
27/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61443 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |