Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 48 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1885 Week
» 13030 Month
» 112815 Year
» 1778191 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2373 on 04/05/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1444   10/11/1946
British Railways 61444   22/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/104/05/1923
B16/3 (4-6-0)15/05/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 04/05/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 28/09/1964 at Drapers (Hull)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A. Draper Hull, 9/64. Cut up 28/9/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
YK   York (North) (New) on 04/05/1923
50B   Hull Dairycoates on 02/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/05/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1491)
06/07/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1573)
18/03/1936 Steam Brake fitted
18/03/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2264)
18/03/1936 Cab side screens fitted
18/10/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2780)
16/02/1940 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3055)
26/09/1942 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3033)
15/05/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3580)
24/05/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3589)
11/11/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3505)
11/01/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24018)
21/03/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24009)
04/07/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24070)
14/10/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24071)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 03/08/1925 23/10/1925 82 days General    
Darlington Works 11/11/1925 23/11/1925 13 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 04/07/1928 18/09/1928 77 days General    
Darlington Works 20/05/1931 06/07/1931 48 days General Standard buffers & hook
Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/01/1936 18/03/1936 71 days General Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/09/1938 18/10/1938 44 days General Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1940 16/02/1940 46 days General Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/08/1942 26/09/1942 31 days General Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 17/10/1944 08/11/1944 23 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 08/02/1945 15/05/1945 97 days General Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3580 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 28/06/1945 07/07/1945 10 days Light Repair Water scoop refitted
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1947 24/05/1947 26 days General Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 13/06/1948 22/06/1948 10 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 61444
 
Darlington Works 10/10/1949 11/11/1949 33 days General Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1951 08/09/1951 30 days General    
Darlington Works 11/12/1953 11/01/1954 32 days General Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 22/02/1956 21/03/1956 29 days General Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1958 04/07/1958 32 days General Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1959 10/04/1959 22 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 11/10/1960 02/11/1960 23 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 20/09/1961 14/10/1961 25 days General Boiler number 24071 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/08/1961 York South York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. SLS/196110
29/10/1961 Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on shed) Ex-Works on shed: D5818/9 new, 43062, 60012/50/92, 61361, 63922, 62040; also 61444 ex-Darlington Works. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/05/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2373
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
03/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1925. Dep: 23/10/1925.    
11/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1925. Dep: 23/11/1925.    
04/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1928. Dep: 18/09/1928.    
20/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1931. Dep: 06/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Standard buffers & hook
Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49)
   
08/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 18/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
   
05/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1938. Dep: 18/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49)
   
02/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1940. Dep: 16/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A)
   
17/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1944. Dep: 08/11/1944.    
08/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1945. Dep: 15/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3580 (Diagram 49A)
   
28/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop refitted
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1444    
29/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1948. Dep: 22/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61444
   
10/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A)
   
10/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951.    
11/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1953. Dep: 11/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A)
   
22/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1958. Dep: 04/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959.    
11/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1960. Dep: 02/11/1960.    
20/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24071 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61444 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
28/09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev