Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 75 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 75 Week
» 11220 Month
» 111005 Year
» 1776381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2377 on 06/06/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1448   15/12/1946
British Railways 61448   09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 06/06/1923 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 41 yrs , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow, Blyth, 9/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GHD   Gateshead (New) on 06/06/1923
BLA   Blaydon on 15/01/1937
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 28/09/1937
YK   York (North) on 28/03/1943
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/06/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1502)
13/02/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1206)
31/01/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1434)
20/03/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1634)
26/10/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2887)
11/07/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2263)
29/07/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3495)
06/07/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3433)
09/10/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3498)
18/07/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24018)
10/10/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24009)
12/01/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24002)
03/05/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24071)
30/06/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24090)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works (scrap yard) New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907
09/07/1961 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. SLS/196108
26/08/1961 York North MPD (50A) At North shed 61448/64 were in steam ex-works, repainted and lined out. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2377
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
13/02/1930 Modification Diagram 49 number D1206 boiler fitted    
31/01/1933 Modification Diagram 49 number D1434 boiler fitted    
20/03/1936 Modification Diagram 49 number D1634 boiler fitted    
15/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
28/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
26/10/1938 Modification Diagram 49 number 2887 boiler fitted    
11/07/1941 Modification Diagram 49 number 2263 boiler fitted    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
29/07/1944 Modification Diagram 49A number 3495 boiler fitted    
06/07/1946 Modification Diagram 49A number 3433 boiler fitted    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1448    
09/10/1948 Modification Diagram 49A number 3498 boiler fitted    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61448    
18/07/1951 Modification Diagram 49A number 24018 boiler fitted    
10/10/1953 Modification Diagram 49A number 24009 boiler fitted    
12/01/1956 Modification Diagram 49A number 24002 boiler fitted    
03/05/1958 Modification Diagram 49A number 24071 boiler fitted    
30/06/1961 Modification Diagram 49A number 24090 boiler fitted    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61448 from York (North) (50A)    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev