Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2378 on 29/06/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1449   05/12/1946
British Railways 61449   29/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/129/06/1923
B16/3 (4-6-0)06/09/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 29/06/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Wed 03/07/1963 off Mirfield (56D)
Service Life 40 yrs , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 23/8/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
YK   York (North) (New) on 29/06/1923
56D   Mirfield on 10/09/1961
     Withdrawn on 03/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   on 03/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/06/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1510)
18/02/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1468)
18/02/1932 Steam Brake fitted
05/04/1935 Cab side screens fitted
05/04/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1442)
22/10/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1468)
22/05/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1631)
14/08/1943 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1667)
06/09/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3506)
14/02/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3505)
28/09/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3491)
16/02/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24012)
19/06/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24053)
30/07/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24018)
03/09/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24081)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 01/03/1926 30/07/1926 152 days General    
Darlington Works 14/07/1927 10/08/1927 28 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 05/09/1927 14/09/1927 10 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 08/10/1928 07/12/1928 61 days General    
Darlington Works 16/10/1929 28/10/1929 13 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 13/01/1932 18/02/1932 37 days General Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 31/01/1935 05/04/1935 65 days General Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49)
Cab side screens fitted
 
Darlington Works 14/09/1937 22/10/1937 39 days General Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/04/1940 22/05/1940 29 days General Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1940 10/06/1940 7 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 13/11/1940 29/11/1940 17 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 01/07/1943 14/08/1943 45 days General Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 15/09/1943 22/09/1943 8 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 17/04/1944 06/09/1944 143 days General Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/09/1944 20/09/1944 8 days Unclassified    
Gateshead Works 21/11/1945 11/12/1945 21 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 18/12/1945 02/02/1946 47 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 21/12/1946 14/02/1947 56 days General Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 11/04/1948 29/04/1948 19 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 61449
 
Darlington Works 02/09/1949 28/09/1949 27 days General Boiler number 3491 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1952 16/02/1952 31 days General Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/01/1954 04/01/1954 1 day Weighing    
Darlington Works 22/05/1954 19/06/1954 29 days General Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 21/06/1954 22/06/1954 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 05/07/1954 06/07/1954 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 14/06/1956 30/07/1956 47 days General Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 07/08/1956 09/08/1956 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 21/12/1958 03/09/1959 257 days General Boiler number 24081 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 16/09/1959 24/09/1959 9 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2378
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1926. Dep: 30/07/1926.    
14/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1927. Dep: 10/08/1927.    
05/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1927. Dep: 14/09/1927.    
08/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1928. Dep: 07/12/1928.    
16/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1929. Dep: 28/10/1929.    
13/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1932. Dep: 18/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
   
31/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1935. Dep: 05/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49)
Cab side screens fitted
   
14/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1937. Dep: 22/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49)
   
24/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1940. Dep: 22/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49)
   
04/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1940. Dep: 10/06/1940.    
13/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1940. Dep: 29/11/1940.    
01/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49)
   
15/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1943. Dep: 22/09/1943.    
17/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1944. Dep: 06/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1944. Dep: 20/09/1944.    
21/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1945. Dep: 11/12/1945.    
18/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946.    
05/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1449    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 14/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A)
   
11/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1948. Dep: 29/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61449
   
02/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1949. Dep: 28/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3491 (Diagram 49A)
   
17/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/01/1954. Dep: 04/01/1954.    
22/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A)
   
21/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1954. Dep: 22/06/1954.    
05/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 06/07/1954.    
14/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1956. Dep: 30/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A)
   
07/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 09/08/1956.    
21/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1958. Dep: 03/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24081 (Diagram 49A)
   
16/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959.    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
03/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61449 from Mirfield (56D)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev