Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 53 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5584 Week
» 7322 Month
» 134765 Year
» 1800141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1372 on 19/10/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1455   30/06/1946
British Railways 61455   16/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/119/10/1923
B16/2 (4-6-0)07/11/1939
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 19/10/1923 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 09/09/1963 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 17/9/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
HTN   Heaton (New) on 19/10/1923
TWD   Tweedmouth on 20/07/1931
YK   York (North) on 16/10/1934
     Withdrawn on 09/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 09/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/10/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1556)
11/01/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1496)
01/02/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1564)
07/11/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2773)
13/03/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2783)
15/07/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3498)
04/05/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3049)
16/07/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3027)
15/03/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24017)
04/07/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24080)
06/08/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24073)
19/10/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24075)
30/12/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24106)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gateshead Works 15/10/1925 10/03/1926 147 days General    
Gateshead Works 03/05/1928 13/07/1928 72 days General    
Darlington Works 22/11/1932 11/01/1933 51 days General Boiler number D1496 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 26/03/1934 27/04/1934 33 days Light Repair After collision
 
Darlington Works 04/12/1934 01/02/1935 60 days General Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/02/1937 18/03/1937 39 days General    
Darlington Works 17/08/1939 07/11/1939 83 days General Rebuilt to class B16/2
Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1942 13/03/1942 31 days General Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/06/1944 15/07/1944 33 days General Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 21/03/1946 04/05/1946 45 days General Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 18/05/1946 23/05/1946 6 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 28/05/1946 31/05/1946 4 days Unclassified    
Gateshead Works 05/05/1947 17/05/1947 13 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 17/06/1948 16/07/1948 30 days General Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61455
 
Darlington Works 04/08/1948 16/08/1948 13 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 19/02/1951 15/03/1951 25 days General Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/06/1953 04/07/1953 27 days General Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/07/1955 06/08/1955 30 days General Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/08/1955 10/08/1955 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 24/09/1957 19/10/1957 26 days General Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1959 11/08/1959 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 26/10/1959 29/10/1959 4 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 08/08/1960 30/12/1960 145 days General Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, ii Parts of Locos) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/10/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1372
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
15/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1925. Dep: 10/03/1926.    
03/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1928. Dep: 13/07/1928.    
20/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
22/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1932. Dep: 11/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1496 (Diagram 49)
   
26/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1934. Dep: 27/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
16/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1934. Dep: 01/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
   
08/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1937. Dep: 18/03/1937.    
17/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1939. Dep: 07/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/2
Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
   
11/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1942. Dep: 13/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49)
   
13/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A)
   
21/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
   
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 23/05/1946.    
28/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1946. Dep: 31/05/1946.    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1455    
05/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947.    
17/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61455
   
04/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 16/08/1948.    
19/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 15/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A)
   
08/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A)
   
08/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A)
   
08/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 10/08/1955.    
24/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A)
   
10/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 11/08/1959.    
26/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 29/10/1959.    
08/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 30/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A)
   
09/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61455 from York (North) (50A)    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev