|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1925 | 10/03/1926 | 147 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/05/1928 | 13/07/1928 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1932 | 11/01/1933 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1496 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1934 | 27/04/1934 | 33 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1934 | 01/02/1935 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1937 | 18/03/1937 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1939 | 07/11/1939 | 83 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/2 Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1942 | 13/03/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1944 | 15/07/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1946 | 23/05/1946 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1946 | 31/05/1946 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1948 | 16/07/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61455 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1948 | 16/08/1948 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1951 | 15/03/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1955 | 10/08/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1959 | 11/08/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1959 | 29/10/1959 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1960 | 30/12/1960 | 145 days | General | Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, ii Parts of Locos) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/10/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1372 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1208 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
15/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1925. Dep: 10/03/1926. | ||
03/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1928. Dep: 13/07/1928. | ||
20/07/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
22/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1932. Dep: 11/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1496 (Diagram 49) |
||
26/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1934. Dep: 27/04/1934. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
16/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1934. Dep: 01/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1937. Dep: 18/03/1937. | ||
17/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1939. Dep: 07/11/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/2 Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1942. Dep: 13/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A) |
||
21/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A) |
||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 23/05/1946. | ||
28/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1946. Dep: 31/05/1946. | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1455 | ||
05/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. | ||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61455 |
||
04/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1948. Dep: 16/08/1948. | ||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 15/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 10/08/1955. | ||
24/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24075 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 11/08/1959. | ||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 29/10/1959. | ||
08/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 30/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24106 (Diagram 49A) |
||
09/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61455 from York (North) (50A) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |