|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 18/11/1925 | 05/02/1926 | 80 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/07/1928 | 26/09/1928 | 70 days | General | Boiler number D1204 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/10/1928 | 30/10/1928 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/02/1929 | 19/02/1929 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1930 | 19/09/1930 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1931 | 11/03/1931 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1931 | 17/06/1931 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1480 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1933 | 02/01/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1936 | 22/05/1936 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1936 | 16/06/1936 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1940 | 26/12/1940 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1943 | 16/12/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/04/1945 | 17/05/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1456 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1950 | 08/07/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3447 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61456 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1952 | 23/11/1952 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1955 | 25/02/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24054 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1956 | 17/05/1956 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1956 | 18/10/1956 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1957 | 28/06/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24100 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1960 | 27/07/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/10/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1373 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1209 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
18/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1925. Dep: 05/02/1926. | ||
19/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1928. Dep: 26/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1204 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1928. Dep: 30/10/1928. | ||
11/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1929. Dep: 19/02/1929. | ||
27/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1930. Dep: 19/09/1930. | ||
23/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1931. Dep: 11/03/1931. | ||
29/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1931. Dep: 17/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1480 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1933. Dep: 02/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1936. Dep: 22/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1936. Dep: 16/06/1936. | ||
19/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1940. Dep: 26/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1943. Dep: 16/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3427 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1945. Dep: 17/05/1945. | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1456 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1950. Dep: 08/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3447 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61456 |
||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 23/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1955. Dep: 25/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24054 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
26/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/04/1956. Dep: 17/05/1956. | ||
15/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1956. Dep: 18/10/1956. | ||
27/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 28/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24100 (Diagram 49A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/07/1960. Dep: 27/07/1960. | ||
01/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61456 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |