Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 49 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5580 Week
» 7318 Month
» 134761 Year
» 1800137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1374 on 23/10/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1457   10/11/1946
British Railways 61457   11/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/123/10/1923
B16/2 (4-6-0)12/10/1939
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 23/10/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off York (North) (50A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow, Blyth, 9/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
YK   York (North) (New) on 23/10/1923
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 27/05/1929
YK   York (North) on 28/03/1943
     Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/10/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1564)
26/02/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1551)
10/05/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1036)
21/09/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1628)
19/03/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2880)
02/09/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3269)
22/03/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3483)
26/08/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3165)
14/03/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24049)
22/04/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24042)
21/12/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24085)
04/02/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24077)
12/08/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24055)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 16/11/1923 22/11/1923 7 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 15/01/1926 28/04/1926 104 days General    
Darlington Works 27/12/1928 26/02/1929 62 days General Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1930 01/07/1930 29 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 29/03/1932 10/05/1932 43 days General Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1934 21/09/1934 36 days General Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1937 19/03/1937 39 days General Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/01/1939 31/01/1939 12 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 06/07/1939 12/10/1939 99 days General Rebuilt to class B16/2
 
Darlington Works 17/12/1941 23/01/1942 38 days General Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 10/03/1944 10/03/1944 1 day Weighing    
Darlington Works 02/08/1944 02/09/1944 32 days General Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 17/01/1946 08/02/1946 23 days Light Repair    
Darlington Works 05/02/1947 22/03/1947 46 days General Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 30/05/1948 11/06/1948 13 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 61457
 
Darlington Works 28/07/1949 26/08/1949 30 days General Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/09/1949 16/09/1949 9 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 08/05/1950 18/05/1950 11 days Light Casual    
Darlington Works 18/02/1952 14/03/1952 26 days General Boiler number 24049 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1954 22/04/1954 35 days General Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1956 21/12/1956 201 days General Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 09/01/1959 04/02/1959 27 days General Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 14/06/1961 12/08/1961 60 days General Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/10/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1374
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
16/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1923. Dep: 22/11/1923.    
15/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1926. Dep: 28/04/1926.    
27/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1928. Dep: 26/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
   
27/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
03/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1930. Dep: 01/07/1930.    
29/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1932. Dep: 10/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49)
   
17/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1934. Dep: 21/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
   
09/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1937. Dep: 19/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49)
   
20/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1939. Dep: 31/01/1939.    
06/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1939. Dep: 12/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/2
   
17/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 23/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/03/1944. Dep: 10/03/1944.    
02/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A)
   
17/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 08/02/1946.    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1457    
05/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A)
   
30/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61457
   
28/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 26/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A)
   
08/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1949. Dep: 16/09/1949.    
08/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 18/05/1950.    
18/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24049 (Diagram 49A)
   
19/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1956. Dep: 21/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A)
   
09/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1959. Dep: 04/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A)
   
14/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61457 from York (North) (50A)    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev