|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 05/02/1926 | 13/10/1926 | 251 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1927 | 02/07/1927 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/10/1928 | 27/12/1928 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1931 | 30/04/1931 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1932 | 04/05/1932 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1932 | 11/10/1932 | 57 days | General | Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1935 | 15/11/1935 | 54 days | General | Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1940 | 07/06/1940 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1941 | 30/05/1941 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1942 | 20/11/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1945 | 02/08/1945 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1945 | 13/08/1945 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1946 | 16/09/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1946 | 08/01/1947 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1947 | 16/01/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/03/1950 | 19/04/1950 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61466 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1950 | 05/05/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24034 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1951 | 27/11/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24040 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1954 | 10/08/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1957 | 04/10/1957 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1957 | 24/10/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
13/09/1959 | Selby & Starbeck MPDs closed | The locomotive depots at Selby and Starbeck were closed as from 13/9/59. As a result, most of their locomotive allocation has been transferred to York (50A) viz. 47438/62, 47581, 61466/9, 62738/53/70, 63348, 63436/49, 64706/25, 64818/21/45/7/55/7/9/61/6, 64904/42/4, 68686, 69910/2, 77004/13. | SLS/195911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1383 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1219 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
05/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1926. Dep: 13/10/1926. | ||
29/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1927. Dep: 02/07/1927. | ||
29/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1928. Dep: 27/12/1928. | ||
22/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1931. Dep: 30/04/1931. | ||
19/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/04/1932. Dep: 04/05/1932. | ||
16/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1932. Dep: 11/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 15/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49) |
||
25/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1940. Dep: 07/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1941. Dep: 30/05/1941. | ||
17/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1942. Dep: 20/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
20/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1945. Dep: 02/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 13/08/1945. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1466 | ||
28/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1946. Dep: 16/09/1946. | ||
30/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 08/01/1947. | ||
13/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 16/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/03/1950. Dep: 19/04/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61466 |
||
26/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1950. Dep: 05/05/1950. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24034 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 27/11/1951. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
06/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24040 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 10/08/1954. | ||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
21/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 04/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1957. Dep: 24/10/1957. | ||
09/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
24/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61466 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |