Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3969 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17375 Week
» 70391 Month
» 189918 Year
» 3216771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2804 |
on |
13/12/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1604 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
61604 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
13/12/1928 |
ELVEDEN |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
23807 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Mon 13/12/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/08/1953 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/12/1928 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/07/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/08/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/08/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2804, name: ELVEDEN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23807 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1604 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61604 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
24/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61604 |
|
|