Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 13 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1850 Week
» 12995 Month
» 112780 Year
» 1778156 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 195 m/e 12/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5195   26/07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1470   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1479   20/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B18
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B1812/1903
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4541
To Service During 12/1903 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Dukinfield 3/48

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 12/1903
IMM   Immingham on 27/04/1923
WFD   Woodford Halse on 28/04/1926
CLK   Colwick on 03/03/1940
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 05/04/1943
CLK   Colwick on 04/07/1943
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 16/01/1944
NEA   Neasden on 20/10/1946
CLK   Colwick on 26/06/1947
ANN   Annesley on 21/09/1947
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 26/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 21/09/1947
WDN ANN Annesley on 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1903 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
17/08/1912 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1213)
18/09/1920 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1205)
20/01/1923 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 833)
06/03/1926 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 681)
25/01/1930 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 55)
18/11/1933 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 798)
07/11/1936 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 802)
29/04/1939 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 798)
26/04/1941 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 681)
30/10/1943 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 798)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 27/04/1912 17/08/1912 113 days General Superheated boiler, piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted
Boiler number 1213 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1920 18/09/1920 36 days General Saturated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1922 20/01/1923 148 days General Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1924 26/07/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5195
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1925 06/03/1926 92 days General Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 04/02/1928 57 days General    
Gorton Works 21/12/1929 25/01/1930 36 days General Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 31/10/1931 43 days General Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1933 18/11/1933 29 days General Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1935 13/04/1935 22 days General    
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 07/11/1936 22 days General Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1939 29/04/1939 29 days General Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1941 26/04/1941 36 days General Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1943 30/10/1943 19 days General Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1946 08/06/1946 15 days General Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947   No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1903 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 195
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4541
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
27/04/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1912. Dep: 17/08/1912.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler, piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted
Boiler number 1213 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
14/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1920. Dep: 18/09/1920.
Work undertaken:
Saturated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
26/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1922. Dep: 20/01/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
27/04/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5195
   
05/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 06/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
28/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928.    
21/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
19/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
21/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935.    
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
01/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
03/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
05/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
04/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
16/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1470 but not taken up    
25/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1479    
26/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1479 from Annesley (ANN)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947.    
03/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    

prev