Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 26 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4003 Week
» 15240 Month
» 248160 Year
» 1913536 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 196 m/e 01/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (Tmp) 196C   10/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5196   18/04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1471   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1480   29/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B18
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 4542
To Service During 01/1904 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 44 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Dukinfield 3/48

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
IMM   Immingham (New) m/e 01/1904
WFD   Woodford Halse on 27/04/1926
NEA   Neasden on 31/03/1928
WFD   Woodford Halse on 23/04/1928
CLK   Colwick on 03/03/1940
LEI   Leicester (G.C.) on 26/05/1940
CLK   Colwick on 05/05/1946
NEA   Neasden on 20/10/1946
CLK   Colwick on 26/06/1947
ANN   Annesley on 21/09/1947
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 26/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 21/09/1947
WDN ANN Annesley on 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
11/12/1909 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1206)
07/12/1918 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1210)
09/04/1927 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 797)
22/11/1930 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 128)
05/12/1931 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 798)
19/08/1933 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 797)
26/12/1936 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 798)
25/02/1939 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 922)
03/05/1941 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 798)
29/12/1945 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 128)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 21/10/1909 11/12/1909 52 days General Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1918 07/12/1918 323 days General Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1922 29/04/1922 50 days General    
Gorton Works 22/09/1923 10/11/1923 50 days General Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 196C
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1925 18/04/1925 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5196
 
Doncaster Works 02/03/1926 06/03/1926 5 days Unclassified Speed indicator and gear fitted for use by Bridge Stress Committee
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1927 09/04/1927 92 days General New superheated boiler piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1928 02/02/1929 50 days General    
Gorton Works 18/10/1930 22/11/1930 36 days General Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1931 05/12/1931 36 days General Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1933 19/08/1933 22 days General Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1935 02/02/1935 22 days General Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1936 26/12/1936 22 days General Heater connection fitted at front end
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1939 25/02/1939 22 days General Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1941 03/05/1941 29 days General Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1943 04/09/1943 18 days Heavy Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 29/12/1945 29 days General Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947   No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 196
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4542
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
21/10/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1909. Dep: 11/12/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
19/01/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1918. Dep: 07/12/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
11/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1922. Dep: 29/04/1922.    
22/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (Tmp) number 196C
   
14/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5196
   
02/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1926. Dep: 06/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Speed indicator and gear fitted for use by Bridge Stress Committee
   
27/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
08/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
New superheated boiler piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
31/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
23/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
15/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929.    
18/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
31/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
29/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
12/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
05/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Heater connection fitted at front end
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
04/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
03/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
26/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
05/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
18/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
01/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1471 but not taken up    
05/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1480    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
26/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1480 from Annesley (ANN)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947.    
03/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    

prev