Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 894 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6390 Week
» 25291 Month
» 25291 Year
» 1690667 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 423 m/e 12/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5423   26/07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1472   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1490   08/12/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1912 SIR SAM FAY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B19
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B1912/1912
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number GO615
To Service During 12/1912 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sat 19/04/1947 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping During y/e 1947 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 12/1912
NEA Neasden on 25/09/1924
GOR Gorton on 12/11/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 27/01/1930
GOR Gorton on 16/09/1930
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 09/12/1930
IMM Immingham on 27/06/1933
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 21/11/1942
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
IMM Immingham on 05/05/1945
   Withdrawn on 19/04/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham on 19/04/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1545)
18/08/1917 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1698)
28/10/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1848)
28/10/1922 Ross Pop
26/07/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
20/03/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1848)
24/07/1926 Converted to oil burnng
26/03/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
05/05/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
30/04/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 424)
29/12/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1922)
31/12/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3007)
21/12/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3017)
03/04/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
05/05/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3046)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1917 18/08/1917 43 days General
Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1922 28/10/1922 64 days General
Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 26/07/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5423
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 20/03/1926 92 days General
Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1926 24/07/1926 1 day Unclassified
Converted to oil burnng
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1927 26/03/1927 71 days General
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1927 15/10/1927 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 10/03/1928 05/05/1928 57 days General
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 14/09/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 27/09/1930 15/11/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 30/04/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1933 08/04/1933 43 days General
After collision at Loughborough 31/1/33
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1934 29/12/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1937 20/02/1937 36 days General
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1938 31/12/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1940 21/12/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1943 03/04/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1943 28/08/1943 4 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/03/1945 05/05/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1947 19/04/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 423, name: SIR SAM FAY
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram GC56a boiler fitted
   
25/09/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
12/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
27/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
05/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1472 but not taken up    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1490    
19/04/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1490 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev