|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1917 | 18/08/1917 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1922 | 28/10/1922 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1924 | 26/07/1924 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5423 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1925 | 20/03/1926 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1926 | 24/07/1926 | 1 day | Unclassified | Converted to oil burnng |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1927 | 26/03/1927 | 71 days | General | Oil burning equipment removed |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1927 | 15/10/1927 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1928 | 05/05/1928 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1929 | 14/09/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1930 | 15/11/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 43 days | General | After collision at Loughborough 31/1/33 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1934 | 29/12/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 36 days | General | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1943 | 03/04/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1945 | 05/05/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 423, name: SIR SAM FAY Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram GC56a boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1917. Dep: 18/08/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1922. Dep: 28/10/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) Ross Pop |
||
31/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5423 |
||
25/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
12/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 20/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1926. Dep: 24/07/1926. Work undertaken: Converted to oil burnng |
||
15/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1927. Dep: 26/03/1927. Work undertaken: Oil burning equipment removed |
||
17/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927. | ||
10/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929. | ||
27/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930. | ||
09/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
02/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. Work undertaken: After collision at Loughborough 31/1/33 |
||
27/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
08/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 29/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
10/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
17/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
25/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1472 but not taken up | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1490 | ||
1947 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton | ||
19/04/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1490 from Immingham (IMM) | ||
19/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. |