Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 8 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17811 Week
» 70827 Month
» 190354 Year
» 3217207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
272 |
|
04/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3272 |
|
04/07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2801 |
|
06/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
236 |
Works Number |
1030 |
To Service |
During 04/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 08/08/1947 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1947 |
Hitchin MPD |
A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Hitchin, 'Cl' 2801/41/59 and 'J3' 4138. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 272 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1030 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/08/1909. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/02/1916. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
27/09/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1922. Dep: 19/02/1923. |
|
|
23/03/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3272
|
|
|
25/08/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
01/03/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1927. Dep: 13/05/1927. |
|
|
12/11/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1928. Dep: 15/02/1929. |
|
|
30/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
04/12/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
25/04/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. |
|
|
30/12/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 17/02/1934. |
|
|
28/03/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. |
|
|
16/07/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. |
|
|
03/02/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. |
|
|
01/02/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941. Work undertaken: After collision
|
|
|
27/02/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943. |
|
|
05/05/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. |
|
|
06/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2801 |
|
|
05/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2801 |
|
|